This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/07/2019 18:30:16

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by ALONSO, ANDRE against ALONSO, DEBRA in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Santa Rosa County Courts
  • Judge MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE
  • Courthouse Santa Rosa County Courthouse
  • County Santa Rosa
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Respondent ALONSO, DEBRA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner ALONSO, ANDRE
  • Represented By
    • MCDANIEL, MARY GAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF RESIDENCY ATTACHED DRIVERS LICENSE- DEBRA
  • 07/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT SPECIAL FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE WITHOUT A HEARING- ANDRES
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT A HEARING
  • 06/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER -DEBRA
  • 06/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE - DEBRA ALONSO
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE DISCLOSURE
  • 06/14/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
  • 06/14/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER
  • 06/14/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage ATTACHED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- ANDRE
  • 06/14/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - ANDRE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - ANDRE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - ANDRE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - ANDRE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF MARY MCDANIEL OBO ANDRE ALONSO
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019027009
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $408.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.