Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/28/2020 at 08:28:50 (UTC).

ADOOR PROPERTIES, LLC, AVANT HOME BUILDERS, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 ADOOR PROPERTIES, LLC, AVANT HOME BUILDERS, INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Appellants

THE SANTA ROSA COUNTY SCHOOL B

SANTA ROSA COUNTY BOARD OF COU

Appellees

ADOOR PROPERTIES, LLC

HENRY COMPANY HOMES, INC.

SAMUEL STEVENS & ASSOCIATES, I

FLYNN BUILDING SPECIALISTS, LL

BELL LANE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PETTINATO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

MIKE PRICE SIGNATURE HOMES, LL

LISTER BUILDERS, LLC

AVANT HOME BUILDERS, INC.

TIMBERLAND CONTRACTORS, LLC

NEWMAN RODGERS CONSTRUCTION, I

HOME BUILDERS ASSOCIATION OF W

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF APPEAL NUMBER-1D20-201

07/31/2020:ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF APPEAL NUMBER-1D20-201

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF APPEAL NUMBER-1D20-201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketAGENCY CASE NUMBER MODIFIED: 1D20-2227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: DICKEY , DARLENE FALLON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020AP000071APAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA ROSA COUNTY is a litigant