This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 17:54:57 (UTC).

XOMPHONPHAKDY, BRANDI VS XOMPHONPHAKDY, TOMMY

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 XOMPHONPHAKDY, BRANDI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against XOMPHONPHAKDY, TOMMY. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

XOMPHONPHAKDY, BRANDI NICOLE

Respondent

XOMPHONPHAKDY, TOMMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE SENT TO VITAL STATISTICS ON DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 8/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - AGREEMENT REACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007684

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 - TOTAL $60.00 MEDIATION FEE < $50K - FD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - BRANDI XOMPHONPHAKDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - BRANDI XOMPHONPHAKDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003253

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00 DISSOLUTION / ANNULMENT / SIMPLIFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less