This case was last updated from Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County on 07/16/2020 at 12:17:59 (UTC).

WOODLAND POINT BWTR 2 LLC AND VS JIM ZINGALE AS THE EXECUTIVE D Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WOODLAND POINT BWTR 2 LLC AND filed an Other lawsuit against JIM ZINGALE AS THE EXECUTIVE D. This case was filed in Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTENSEN, PATTI A and CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI A

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODLAND POINT BWTR 2 LLC AND

Defendants

JIM ZINGALE AS THE EXECUTIVE D

LINDA MYERS AS THE TAX COLLECT

TIMOTHY E PARKER AS THE PROPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAHL, SHAINA

Defendant Attorney

SHARBAUGH, R KEVIN

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/13/2020:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TAX COLLECTOR

05/13/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TAX COLLECTOR

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/07/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

05/06/2020:AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

05/05/2020:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/04/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

04/17/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JIM ZINGALE FL DEPT OF REVENUE

04/13/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JIM ZINGALE FL DEPT OF REVENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA MYERS TAX COLLECTOR

04/13/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA MYERS TAX COLLECTOR

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TIMOTHY E PARKER PROPERTY APPRAISER

04/13/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TIMOTHY E PARKER PROPERTY APPRAISER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 7/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CASE NUMBER 2019 CA 449 CAAXMX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketANSWER - PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF TAX COLLECTOR TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTE FROM CLERK: SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED UNTIL ADA INFORMATION IS UPDATED ($30 SUMMONS FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2019015496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less