This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 12/17/2020 at 22:34:33 (UTC).

WEST, KELLY M VS WEST, STEVEN D

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 WEST, KELLY M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WEST, STEVEN D. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEST, KELLY M

Respondent

WEST, STEVEN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WAGNER, LINDA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: STEVEN WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2020011543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - COPY OF PETITIONERS DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAGNER, LINDA A.