This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 12/10/2020 at 22:33:32 (UTC).

TILLIS, MATTHEW DALE VS ELLIS, KRISTA

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 TILLIS, MATTHEW DALE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ELLIS, KRISTA. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TILLIS, MATTHEW DALE

Respondent

ELLIS, KRISTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KENNY, RENAE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR MINOR CHILD TO TESTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketFATHER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF THE STANDARD FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER - EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PETITIONER AND SUMMONS TO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: KRISTA ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020011393

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenny, Renae