This case was last updated from Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County on 10/14/2021 at 20:34:15 (UTC).

THOMAS, ARIC VS BARZELOGNA, CALEB Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 THOMAS, ARIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BARZELOGNA, CALEB. This case was filed in Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JANESK, KENNETH J II and JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JANESK, KENNETH J II

JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, ARIC

Defendants

BARZELOGNA, RICHARD

BARZELOGNA, CALEB

METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, GEORGE HOLLAND

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/20/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/20/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

09/20/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/20/2021:PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CALEB BARZELOGNA

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CALEB BARZELOGNA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RICHARD BARZELOGNA

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RICHARD BARZELOGNA

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/20/2021:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED BRIANNA LARRY AS ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY FOR METROPOLITAN CASUALITY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED BRIANNA LARRY AS ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY FOR METROPOLITAN CASUALITY INSURANCE COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARZELOGNA, WIFE, FOR RICHARD BARZELOGNA - 10/5/2021

10/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARZELOGNA, WIFE, FOR RICHARD BARZELOGNA - 10/5/2021

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARSELOGNA, MOTHER FOR CALEB BARSELOGNA - 10/5/2021

10/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARSELOGNA, MOTHER FOR CALEB BARSELOGNA - 10/5/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARSELOGNA, MOTHER FOR CALEB BARSELOGNA - 10/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUSAN BARZELOGNA, WIFE, FOR RICHARD BARZELOGNA - 10/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED BRIANNA LARRY AS ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY FOR METROPOLITAN CASUALITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: RICHARD BARZELOGNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CALEB BARZELOGNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2021010396

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $430.00 STANDARD FILING FEE - CA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON GEORGE H III