This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 03/19/2021 at 22:47:16 (UTC).

STAGER, RACHEL VS FISHER, MAXIMILLIAN

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 STAGER, RACHEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against FISHER, MAXIMILLIAN. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STAGER, RACHEL

Respondent

FISHER, MAXIMILLIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 02/26/21 : IND : TEMP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 3/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEMAIL FROM ST. JOHNS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - TEMP SERVED 02/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEMAILED CONFIRMATION TO SJCSO: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVICE PACKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CONFIDENTIAL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EMAIL - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPREPPING FOR INJUNCTION HEARINGS 101 AND WHAT TO EXPECT - SIGNED RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less