This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 04/08/2021 at 22:52:41 (UTC).

SANDERS, JOAN VS MYERS, PATRIC D

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 SANDERS, JOAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MYERS, PATRIC D. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDERS, JOAN

Respondent

MYERS, PATRIC D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEMAILED CONFIRMATION TO PCSO: ORDER EXTENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 03/18/2021: IND : TEMP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDEPUTY CLERK PROCESSING INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY OF MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA