This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 06/15/2019 at 21:30:35 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS QUEEN, STEVEN GARRETT

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against QUEEN, STEVEN GARRETT. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORRIS, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORRIS, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

QUEEN, STEVEN GARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, JOSEPH F

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STEVEN G. QUEEN (SON) FOR STEVEN QUEEN 6/7/2019

06/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STEVEN G. QUEEN (SON) FOR STEVEN QUEEN 6/7/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED:

05/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED:

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

05/30/2019:PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STEVEN G. QUEEN (SON) FOR STEVEN QUEEN 6/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - PROPOSED - E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,470.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Event Date: 09/06/2019 09:30; Judge: MORRIS, ELIZABETH A; Docket Type: P1; Location: MX 302

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F