This case was last updated from Putnam County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 08/14/2022 at 20:51:35 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES UNDER KARE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES UNDER KARE. This case was filed in Putnam County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JANESK, KENNETH J II and JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II

JANESK, KENNETH J II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES UNDER KARE

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND UNKNOWN PA

LAWLER TIPTON AS HEIR, TERESA

LAWLER AS POTENTIAL HEIR, TRAC

LAWLER AS POTENTIAL HEIR, TODD

LAWLER AS POTENTIAL HEIR, R TR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, SHAWN LEE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

07/22/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

07/22/2022:COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/02/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

MOTION TO APPOINT PRIVATE PROCESS SERVERS

08/04/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PRIVATE PROCESS SERVERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $39.00 Receipt Number MX 2022009463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PRIVATE PROCESS SERVERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 - TOTAL $39.00 LIS PENDENS - RECORDING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $464.50 ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS OVER 5 - CA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR, SHAWN LEE