This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 00:57:40 (UTC).

PERRY, DEBRA VS PERRY, JERRY L

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 PERRY, DEBRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PERRY, JERRY L. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PERRY, DEBRA

Respondent

PERRY, JERRY L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2020004418

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less