This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 00:57:47 (UTC).

PEREZ-MARTINEZ, GABRIELA VS PEREZ OSORIO, LEONEL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 PEREZ-MARTINEZ, GABRIELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ OSORIO, LEONEL. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ-MARTINEZ, GABRIELA

Respondent

PEREZ OSORIO, LEONEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, CATHERINE ELIZABETH

Respondent Attorney

CAMPBELL, LINDA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCONSENT ORDER ON WIFE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING - MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Linda L