This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 07/17/2020 at 18:04:24 (UTC).

PEEDIN, DANIEL, PEEDIN, THOMAS D Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 PEEDIN, DANIEL, PEEDIN, THOMAS D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN

 

Party Details

Decedent

PEEDIN, THOMAS D

Not Classified By Court

PEEDIN, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JOHNSON, WILLIAM ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS - FIRST PUBLICATION DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE CATHERINE D MUELLER MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF DANIEL THOMAS PEEDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE CATHERINE MUELLER MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF JOHN HAVEY PEEDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006191

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH (eportal filing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - PHOTOCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR THOMAS DANIEL PEEDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON , WILLIAM ARTHUR