This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 12:52:48 (UTC).

NEW, AMBER NICOLE VS CROWLEY, ROBERT JR

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 NEW, AMBER NICOLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CROWLEY, ROBERT JR. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEW, AMBER NICOLE

Respondent

CROWLEY, ROBERT JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - AMBER NEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ROBERT CROWLEY JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF REQUIRED NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less