This case was last updated from Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County on 12/14/2020 at 20:30:43 (UTC).

N F LLC VS R, T

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 N F LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against R, T. This case was filed in Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTENSEN, PATTI A and CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Seventh Circuit Courts - Putnam County

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI A

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N F LLC

Defendant

R, T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPOLSKI, SCOTT JOHN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES

12/03/2020:NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES

PETITION

11/20/2020:PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2020 @ 9:30 AM - PETITION

12/03/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2020 @ 9:30 AM - PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/20/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/30/2020 09:30; Judge: CHRISTENSEN, PATTI A; Docket Type: CA; Location: PUTNAM COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2020 @ 9:30 AM - PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020011316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less