This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 05/17/2021 at 22:32:44 (UTC).

MORRIS, NINA MAUREEN VS MORRIS, MICHAEL GLENN

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 MORRIS, NINA MAUREEN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MORRIS, MICHAEL GLENN. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS, NINA MAUREEN

Respondent

MORRIS, MICHAEL GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELANGER, KRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 05/10/2021: IND : ORDER EXTENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR TRIAL - AMY PATERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEMAILED CONFIRMATION TO PCSO: ORDER EXTENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 04/27/2021: IND : TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EMAIL - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPREPPING FOR INJUNCTION HEARINGS 101 AND WHAT TO EXPECT - SIGNED RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET FOR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELANGER, KRISTINA