This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 13:28:03 (UTC).

MONROE, ASHLEY NICOLE VS CONTRERAS, LUIS ANGEL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MONROE, ASHLEY NICOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CONTRERAS, LUIS ANGEL. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONROE, ASHLEY NICOLE

Respondent

CONTRERAS, LUIS ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELANGER, KRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 6/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARM(S) AND/OR AMMUNITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 05/26/20 : IND : TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET FOR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELANGER, KRISTINA