This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:19:16 (UTC).

MILLS, SHONTAE NICOLE VS SUGDEN, ROY III

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 MILLS, SHONTAE NICOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SUGDEN, ROY III. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLS, SHONTAE NICOLE

Respondent

SUGDEN, ROY III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, CATHERINE ELIZABETH

Respondent Attorney

LOBIANCO, CHRISTOPHER W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCONSENT ORDER STRIKING FILING FROM DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC ON ROY SUGDEN SVD 07/21/2020 DUE 08/10/2020 DEFAULT 08/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - FATHER'S REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF AS PLED IN PARAGRAPH 10 OF THE ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION FOR PATERNITY, DKT #27 FILED 07/06/20; MOTHER'S REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RELEIF AS PLED IN PARAGRAPH 10 OF THE AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND OTHER RELIEF, DKT #20 FILED 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - ROY SUGDEN III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSUPERVISED / SAFETY FOCUSED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - SHONTAE MILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CHILD PICKUP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICKUP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LoBianco, Christopher W