This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 11/13/2021 at 03:13:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS TILTON, ROBIN

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TILTON, ROBIN. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORRIS, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORRIS, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

TILTON, ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $ $1,525.66

10/11/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $ $1,525.66

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/11/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN TILTON

10/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN TILTON

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021

10/27/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021

RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021 (ATTY COPY)

11/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021 (ATTY COPY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/02/2021 10:30; Judge: MORRIS, ELIZABETH A; Docket Type: P1; Location: PUTNAM COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021 (ATTY COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ROBIN TILTON 10-25-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN TILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - PROPOSED - E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $ $1,525.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2021011306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $185.00 SMALL CLAIMS >$500 <= $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E