This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 03/23/2021 at 22:56:41 (UTC).

MARCUM, KATHY A VS MASTELLER, DALE E

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 MARCUM, KATHY A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MASTELLER, DALE E. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARCUM, KATHY A

Respondent

MASTELLER, DALE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEISELMAN TITUS, JENNIFER RUTH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 3/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARM(S) AND/OR AMMUNITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OR ELECTRONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 03/03/21 : IND : TEMP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EMAIL - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPREPPING FOR INJUNCTION HEARINGS 101 AND WHAT TO EXPECT - SIGNED RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less