This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:19:23 (UTC).

LASLEY, GEORGE VS KELLY, MARY

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 LASLEY, GEORGE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KELLY, MARY. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LASLEY, GEORGE

Respondent

KELLY, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WOOD, GARRY

Respondent Attorney

STIMPSON, ELIKA OTOYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER/HUSBAND'S PROPOSED TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF THE STANDARD FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER - EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PETITIONER AND SUMMONS TO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARY KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD, GARRY