This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/08/2019 19:30:57

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Property - Other Property case was filed by LARGER, VICTOR against ERVIN, DEBBIE AND ALL OCCUPANT in the jurisdiction of Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Property
  • Jurisdiction Putnam County Courts
  • Judge MORRIS, ELIZABETH A
  • Courthouse Putnam County Courthouse
  • County Putnam
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant HERSEY, MICHELLE AND ALL OCCUP
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff LARGER, VICTOR
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ERVIN, DEBBIE AND ALL OCCUPANT
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED:

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED:

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED:

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED:

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/...

06/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN AND ALL O...

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN (MOTHER) FOR MICHELL...

06/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN (MOTHER) ...

Free with Subscription
NOTICE OF HEARING JULY 8, 2019 at 11:30am - DEFENDANT'S MOTI...

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING JULY 8, 2019 at 11:30am - DEFEN...

Free with Subscription
MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT DUE

06/19/2019:MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT DUE

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • Payment received: $489.25 Receipt Number MX 2019008673
  • 07/08/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 3 - TOTAL $489.25
  • 06/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING JULY 8, 2019 at 11:30am - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT DUE
  • 06/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/19/2019
  • 06/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEBBIE ERVIN (MOTHER) FOR MICHELLE HERSEY AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/19/2019
  • 06/19/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT DUE
  • 06/19/2019
  • ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT DEFENDANT POSTED RENT IN COURT REGISTRY
  • 06/19/2019
  • Payment received: $971.75 Receipt Number MX 2019007774
  • 06/19/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 - TOTAL $971.75
  • 06/18/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - MAILED COPY OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WITH A COPY OF THE LEASE AGREEMENT
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHELLE HERSEY AND ALL OCCUPANTS
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: DEBBIE ERVIN AND ALL OCCUPANTS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Compliance CCCI has been created
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007595
  • 06/17/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $205.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY
  • 06/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON-MILITARY SERVICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENNANT/NON PAYMENT OF RENT $950.00

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.