This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 17:24:10 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, CRYSTAL GRACE VS HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ, JESUS OMAR

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 HERNANDEZ, CRYSTAL GRACE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ, JESUS OMAR. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ, CRYSTAL GRACE

Respondent

HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ, JESUS OMAR

Not Classified By Court

REVENUE, DEPARTMENT OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE SENT TO VITAL STATISTICS ON DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 5/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - JESUS HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CRYSTAL HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVENUE, DEPARTMENT OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A