This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:19:02 (UTC).

HENDRITH, SAMUEL NATHAN VS HENDRITH, LERONICA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 HENDRITH, SAMUEL NATHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HENDRITH, LERONICA. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HENDRITH, SAMUEL NATHAN

Respondent

HENDRITH, LERONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC ON LERONICA HENDRITH SVD UN-EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: LERONICA HENDRITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF INDIGENCY - ELIGIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less