This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:18:26 (UTC).

HARVEY, ROBIN VS WENDEL, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 HARVEY, ROBIN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WENDEL, ROBERT. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARVEY, ROBIN

Respondent

WENDEL, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 6/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARM(S) AND/OR AMMUNITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketFIREARM SURRENDER AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC:SVD 06/08/20 : IND : TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EMAIL - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPREPPING FOR INJUNCTION HEARINGS 101 AND WHAT TO EXPECT - SIGNED RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDESCRIPTION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less