This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:18:56 (UTC).

HAMM, JEANNIE RENEE VS HAMM, MICHAEL PAUL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 HAMM, JEANNIE RENEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HAMM, MICHAEL PAUL. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAMM, JEANNIE RENEE

Respondent

HAMM, MICHAEL PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - JEANNIE HAMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSUPERVISED/SAFETY FOCUSED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT AND/OR CLERICUS CHANGE OF NAME OR ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC ON MICHAEL HAMM SUB SVD KAITLYN RIVERA SVD 06/17/2020 DUE 07/07/2020 DEFAULT 07/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL HAMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF INDIGENCY - ELIGIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less