This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 18:22:00 (UTC).

GREMS, LISA NICOLE VS GREMS, WAYLON

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 GREMS, LISA NICOLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GREMS, WAYLON. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREMS, LISA NICOLE

Respondent

GREMS, WAYLON WILLIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE SENT TO VITAL STATISTICS ON DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 8/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - AGREEMENT REACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF INDIGENCY - ELIGIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE CREATED AND ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - LISA GREMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00 DISSOLUTION / ANNULMENT / SIMPLIFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less