This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 16:40:10 (UTC).

GEYER, TASHALA VS DEERING, SHERITA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 GEYER, TASHALA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DEERING, SHERITA. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WASHINGTON, ALICIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WASHINGTON, ALICIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEYER, TASHALA

Respondents

MCCRAY, KELVIN

DEERING, SHERITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURNS, ERICA GAYLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 9/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketORDER ON PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR TEMPORARY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONCURRENT CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketRTN OF SVC ON SHERITA DEERING SUB SVD SHARONDA DEERING SVD 03/26/2021 DUE 04/15/2021 DEFAULT 04/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHERITA DEERING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002639

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $410.00 ISSUE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS ERICA G