This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/08/2019 19:34:54

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Property - Other Property case was filed by FALK, LLOYD H against CZECHOWSKI, JAMES in the jurisdiction of Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Property
  • Jurisdiction Putnam County Courts
  • Judge MORRIS, ELIZABETH A
  • Courthouse Putnam County Courthouse
  • County Putnam
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant CZECHOWSKI, JAMES
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant CZECHOWSKI, MICHELLE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff FALK, LLOYD H
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED: - MICHELLE

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: - MICHELLE

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED: - JAMES CZECHOWSKI

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: - JAMES CZECHOWSKI

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MICHELLE CZECHOWSKI 6/20/2019

06/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MICHELLE CZECHOWSKI 6/...

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED JAMES CZECHOWSKI 6/20/2019

06/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED JAMES CZECHOWSKI 6/20/...

Free with Subscription
DEFAULT ENTERED

07/01/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION
  • 07/01/2019
  • JUDGMENT - PROPOSED
  • 07/01/2019
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND COSTS
  • 07/01/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED
  • 07/01/2019
  • DEFAULT - PROPOSED
  • 07/01/2019
  • MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT
  • 06/24/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED JAMES CZECHOWSKI 6/20/2019
  • 06/24/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MICHELLE CZECHOWSKI 6/20/2019
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: - MICHELLE
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: - JAMES CZECHOWSKI
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007575
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE - MICHELLE CZECHOWSKI
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE - JAMES CZECHOWSKI
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT $1,000
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $205.00

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.