This case was last updated from Putnam County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 05/16/2022 at 20:33:08 (UTC).

ELKINS, LAFONDA TANANARIE VS ANDREWS, JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 ELKINS, LAFONDA TANANARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREWS, JAMES. This case was filed in Putnam County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JANESK, KENNETH J II and JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JANESK, KENNETH J II

JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELKINS, LAFONDA TANANARIE

Defendants

SCATURRO, EDWARD NEIL

ANDREWS, JAMES

ST JOHNS RIVER WATER MANAGEMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOSS, ADY A.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/22/2022:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES D ANDREWS

04/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES D ANDREWS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDWARD SCATURRO

04/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDWARD SCATURRO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

04/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

05/03/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT EDWARD SCATURRO

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT EDWARD SCATURRO

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ERWARD SCATURRO

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ERWARD SCATURRO

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

05/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

05/16/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO EDWARD SCATURRO

05/16/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO EDWARD SCATURRO

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

05/16/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO EDWARD SCATURRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ERWARD SCATURRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT EDWARD SCATURRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JAMES D ANDREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ST JOHN'S RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDWARD SCATURRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES D ANDREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $430.00 STANDARD FILING FEE - CA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADY GOSS