This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 00:58:05 (UTC).

DYKES, KATHERINE ELIZABETH VS COOK, JOSHUA ALEXANDER JR

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 DYKES, KATHERINE ELIZABETH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against COOK, JOSHUA ALEXANDER JR. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DYKES, KATHERINE ELIZABETH

Respondent

COOK, JOSHUA ALEXANDER JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, CATHERINE ELIZABETH

Respondent Attorney

SHARBAUGH, R KEVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE SENT TO VITAL STATISTICS:BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 8/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2020008140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 - TOTAL $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - AGREEMENT REACHED - TO BE SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2020007998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 - TOTAL $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMOTHER'S VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CHILD PICKUP ORDER AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020004420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharbaugh, R Kevin