This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:18:20 (UTC).

DRIGGERS, TAMMY LYNNETTE VS DRIGGERS, BRAD TRENTON

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 DRIGGERS, TAMMY LYNNETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DRIGGERS, BRAD TRENTON. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DRIGGERS, TAMMY LYNNETTE

Respondent

DRIGGERS, BRAD TRENTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, CATHERINE ELIZABETH

Respondent Attorney

THIBAULT, RICHARD K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - BRAD DRIGGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket10-DAY NOTICE OF HUSBAND'S DEFICIENCIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - TAMMY DRIGGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIBAULT, RICHARD K