This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/17/2020 at 18:05:09 (UTC).

DELPRINCE, CHRIS, KENDRICK, PATRICK D Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 DELPRINCE, CHRIS, KENDRICK, PATRICK D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DELPRINCE, CHRIS

Decedent

KENDRICK, PATRICK D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketWILL SENT TO OFFICIAL RECORDS TO BE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF RIGHT TO SERVE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - JONATHAN KINNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH (original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006193

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less