This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/07/2020 at 23:19:46 (UTC).

CURRIE, CHRISTOPHER LEE VS HOFFMAN, AMBER C

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 CURRIE, CHRISTOPHER LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HOFFMAN, AMBER C. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURRIE, CHRISTOPHER LEE

Respondent

HOFFMAN, AMBER C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketRTN OF SVC ON AMBER HOFFMAN SUB SVD MICHAEL CURIE SVD 03/24/2020 DUE 04/13/2020 DEFAULT 04/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: AMBER HOFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF INDIGENCY - ELIGIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EMAIL - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CHRISTOPHER CURRIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketIDENTIFICATION - DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less