This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 14:19:29 (UTC).

COX, MARY ANN VS COX, PHILIP JAMES

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 COX, MARY ANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COX, PHILIP JAMES. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COX, MARY ANN

Respondent

COX, PHILIP JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

FAGAN, CARLTON DUKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 8/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - AGREEMENT REACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketANSWER, MOTION TO STRIKE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketORDER REFERRING CASE TO FAMILY MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLERK REQUESTING ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGAN, CARLTON DUKE JR