This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 00:57:59 (UTC).

COTHRON, CHRISTINA VS COTHRON, ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 COTHRON, CHRISTINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COTHRON, ANTHONY. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COTHRON, CHRISTINA

Respondent

COTHRON, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRICE, RICHARD ANDREWS

Respondent Attorney

YOUNG, GEORGE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE (REMOTE APPEARANCE ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY COTHRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2020004508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS PROVIDED FOR CLERK TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketVITALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY : PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less