This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/17/2020 at 18:05:49 (UTC).

COOK, HALLIE E, COOK, ROY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 COOK, HALLIE E, COOK, ROY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COOK, ROY

Decedent

COOK, HALLIE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HEDSTROM, DALLAS R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 6/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006192

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH (eportal filing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less