This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 00:57:52 (UTC).

BRADLEY, JESSICA LEANNE VS PATRICK, TIMOTHY CHANCE

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 BRADLEY, JESSICA LEANNE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PATRICK, TIMOTHY CHANCE. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Putnam County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRADLEY, JESSICA LEANNE

Respondent

PATRICK, TIMOTHY CHANCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 7/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketINCOME DEDUCTION ORDER ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS - DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS - DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less