This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/08/2019 19:33:16

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Property - Other Property case was filed by BENSON, LAURA against HOWARD, KEVIN AND ALL OCCUPANT in the jurisdiction of Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Property - Other Property
  • Jurisdiction Putnam County Courts
  • Judge MORRIS, ELIZABETH A
  • Courthouse Putnam County Courthouse
  • County Putnam
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff BENSON, LAURA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant HOWARD, KEVIN AND ALL OCCUPANT
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/28/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED:

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED:

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED KEVIN HOWARD AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/...

06/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED KEVIN HOWARD AND ALL O...

Free with Subscription
ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND COSTS

06/28/2019:ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND COSTS

Free with Subscription
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (SIGNED 6/27/2019)

06/27/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (SIGNED 6/27/2019)

Free with Subscription
CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

06/14/2019:CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVI...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED on 6/28/2019
  • 06/28/2019
  • ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND COSTS
  • 06/27/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (SIGNED 6/27/2019)
  • 06/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED KEVIN HOWARD AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/19/2019
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED:
  • 06/17/2019
  • Compliance CCCI has been created
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007590
  • 06/17/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $195.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY
  • 06/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON-MILITARY SERVICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENNANT/NON PAYMENT OF RENT $1,939.00

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.