This case was last updated from Putnam County Florida Courts on 09/11/2020 at 12:02:59 (UTC).

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS L VS WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Putnam County Florida Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORRIS, ELIZABETH ANNE and MORRIS, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Putnam, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORRIS, ELIZABETH ANNE

MORRIS, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS L

Defendant

WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHUSTER, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

CUTILLO, CHRISTIAN LEIGH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT $ 5,214.18

01/22/2020:COMPLAINT $ 5,214.18

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

01/22/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/22/2020:DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

01/22/2020:PROPOSED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED:

02/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED:

RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED MEAGAN JOHNSON (AUTHORIZED AGENT) FOR ROBERT VEZINA,III WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION 2/14/2020

02/20/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED MEAGAN JOHNSON (AUTHORIZED AGENT) FOR ROBERT VEZINA,III WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION 2/14/2020

WATSON'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/05/2020:WATSON'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

03/05/2020:MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

03/17/2020:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

03/19/2020:PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL HEARING 6/12/2020 AT 9:30am

04/30/2020:NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL HEARING 6/12/2020 AT 9:30am

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING

05/27/2020:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 9-2-2020 @ 2:35 pm

07/27/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 9-2-2020 @ 2:35 pm

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC D/B/A AT&T FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/01/2020:BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC D/B/A AT&T FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/02/2020 14:35; Judge: MORRIS, ELIZABETH A; Docket Type: P1; Location: PUTNAM COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT; Defendant Attorney: Cutillo, Christian L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED on 9/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC D/B/A AT&T FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 9-2-2020 @ 2:35 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/12/2020 09:30; Judge: MORRIS, ELIZABETH A; Docket Type: P1; Location: PUTNAM COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT; Defendant Attorney: Cutillo, Christian L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL HEARING 6/12/2020 AT 9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/24/2020 09:30; Judge: MORRIS, ELIZABETH A; Docket Type: P1; Location: PUTNAM COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT; Defendant Attorney: Cutillo, Christian L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE FROM CLERK: ATTORNEY NEEDS TO SUBMIT A SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS NOT A 20 DAY SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020000841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT $ 5,214.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUTILLO , CHRISTIAN LEIGH