This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 07/08/2019 19:32:34

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Property - Other Property case was filed by ASPINWALL, STUART JOHN against SMITH, PAUL AND ALL OCCUPANTS in the jurisdiction of Putnam County Courts, Putnam County Courthouse located in Putnam, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Property
  • Jurisdiction Putnam County Courts
  • Judge MORRIS, ELIZABETH A
  • Courthouse Putnam County Courthouse
  • County Putnam
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant SMITH, PAUL AND ALL OCCUPANTS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant STRONG, SHAUN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff ASPINWALL, STUART JOHN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED: SHAUN STRONG

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: SHAUN STRONG

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCCUPANTS

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHAUN STRONG AND ALL OCCUPANTS 0-...

06/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHAUN STRONG AND ALL O...

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/20...

06/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCC...

Free with Subscription
CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

06/14/2019:CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVI...

Free with Subscription
COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENNANT (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

06/14/2019:COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENNANT (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCCUPANTS 6/20/2019
  • 06/21/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHAUN STRONG AND ALL OCCUPANTS 0-19-2019
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: SHAUN STRONG AND ALL OCCUPANTS
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL SMITH AND ALL OCCUPANTS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Compliance CCCI has been created
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007597
  • 06/17/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $205.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY
  • 06/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON-MILITARY SERVICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENNANT (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.