This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/26/2023 at 15:20:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WHITE JOSHUA EUGENE

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WHITE JOSHUA EUGENE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN L BARBER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN L BARBER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WHITE JOSHUA EUGENE

Lakeland, FL 33802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA VANESSA

P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33881-9000

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

12/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

BOOKING SHEET

12/21/2022: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/21/22

12/21/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/21/22

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/27/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/27/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

12/27/2022: ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

01/05/2023: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/18/2023: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

COURT NOTIFICATION

01/19/2023: COURT NOTIFICATION

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

01/19/2023: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INSPECT\COPY\TEST\PHOTO INFO & MATERIAL

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF INTENT TO INSPECT\COPY\TEST\PHOTO INFO & MATERIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/30/2023; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F3; Judge: SUSAN L BARBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO INSPECT\COPY\TEST\PHOTO INFO & MATERIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketRe: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY JULICLAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JULICLAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: RESIST OFFICER W/VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.01; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD202200156755; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 12/20/2022; OBTS : 5309015295; Offense Date : 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DEPRIVE MEANS OF PROTECT COMM; Statute: 843.025; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD202200156755; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 12/20/2022; OBTS : 5309015295; Offense Date : 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: AGG BATT ON LEO/EMERG MED CARE PROVIDER; Statute: 784.07.2D; Level: F; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD202200156755; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 12/20/2022; OBTS : 5309015295; Offense Date : 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less