This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/07/2023 at 12:02:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WASHINGTON SAREENA

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WASHINGTON SAREENA. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LD

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

WASHINGTON SAREENA

Lakeland, FL 33810

WASHINGTON SAREENA ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEL WILLIAM PAUL

Post Office Box 6069

Lakeland, FL 33807

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/01/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOOK-IN SHEET

12/01/2022: BOOK-IN SHEET

BOND

12/01/2022: BOND

DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

12/01/2022: DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

12/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/5/23

01/05/2023: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/5/23

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/21/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: LAKELAND GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: L1; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/05/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: LAKELAND GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: L1; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Court Phase; Description: DISORDERLY INTOXICATION; Statute: 856.011; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Same; Plea: NO PLEA; Disposition/Action: Pre-Trial Diversion; Disposition/Action Date: 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY PATSJUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, FRIEL WILLIAM PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/5/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, FRIEL WILLIAM PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketASA of Record, WRIGHT VALERIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Pros Phase; Description: DISORDERLY INTOXICATION; Statute: 856.011; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • BondBond Number: B189137; Bond Date: 12/01/2022; Bond Amount: 250.00; Bond Type: Cash; Bond Status: DISCHARGED/CANCELLED; Bond Agent: CASH; Booking Number : 2240101; Issue Date : 11/22/2022; Filed Date : 12/01/2022; Release Date : 01/05/2023; Release Reason : DIVR; Forfeit Mail Date: 01/01/1900; Agent Info: Bond Agent code : CASH; Name : CASH BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketFL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRANSCRIPT OF DRIVER RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOK-IN SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JOANAMAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/5/2023 / NCCF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: DISORDERLY INTOXICATION; Statute: 856.011; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD202200149427; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 11/22/2022; Name at Arrest : WASHINGTON SAREENA ROBIN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant