This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/23/2022 at 15:11:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. VECTOR SECURITY 37463

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VECTOR SECURITY 37463. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

VECTOR SECURITY 37463

Gainesville, VA 20155-4061

THE TJX COMPANIES INC

THE TJX COMPANIES INC C/O ALARM SERVICES

MARSHALLS #1463

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING / CHECK STUB

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF FILING / CHECK STUB

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS VIII; Statute: 97-36C8; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 06/17/2022; Agency Report Num : PCSOS221390424; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; NTA Issue Date : 05/19/2022; Offense Date : 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 9205766; Receipt Date: 06/17/2022; Receipt Amount: 508.00; Paying Customer: VECTOR SECURITY 37463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING / CHECK STUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 06/16/2022; Due Date: 07/18/2022; Fee Desc: False Security Alarm VIII - MO;; Fee Amount: 508.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED - HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant