This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/17/2022 at 16:08:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TACO BELL 35886

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TACO BELL 35886. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

TACO BELL 35886

Morrisville, NC 27560

LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC, DBA TACO BELL #185

LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING / STUB

06/07/2022: NOTICE OF FILING / STUB

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS VI; Statute: 97-36P6; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 06/07/2022; Agency Report Num : PCSOS221290118; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; NTA Issue Date : 05/09/2022; Offense Date : 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 9188989; Receipt Date: 06/07/2022; Receipt Amount: 308.00; Paying Customer: TACO BELL 35886

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING / STUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 06/04/2022; Due Date: 07/05/2022; Fee Desc: Co Security Alarm Viol Cl VI;; Fee Amount: 308.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED / HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Taco Bell of America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant