This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 18:14:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SURRETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN LOUISE

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SURRETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN LOUISE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

SURRETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN LOUISE

Auburndale, FL 33823

SURRETT CHRISTIN

SURRETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN L

SURRETT-DULUCA CHRISTIN

DELUCA CHRISTIN

SURRET-DELUCA CHRISTIN

SURRETT CHRISTIN L

SURRETT CHRISTIN LOUISE

SURRETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN

SOVVETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN

SURRETT-DE LUCA CHRISTIN L

HALL BREAWNA LYNNE

Lakeland, FL 33805

HALL BREAWNA

HALL BREAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KAYLOR MATTHEW

Attorney at KAYLOR LAW GROUP

Kaylor Law Group, 3001 Us Highway 98 South

Lakeland, FL 33803-0000

 

Court Documents

SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORE SHEET

12/31/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORE SHEET

JUDGMENT/SENTENCE PACKET RECORDED

12/31/2020: JUDGMENT/SENTENCE PACKET RECORDED

WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

11/12/2020: WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

PENDING PROCESSING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

11/06/2020: PENDING PROCESSING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

PLEA FORM

11/06/2020: PLEA FORM

MONETARY OBLIGATION ORDER

11/06/2020: MONETARY OBLIGATION ORDER

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/05/20 COPY SENT TO ATTY

11/06/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/05/20 COPY SENT TO ATTY

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

10/15/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

10/06/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 9-29-20

09/30/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 9-29-20

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

08/25/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

07/27/2020: DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

07/23/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

07/22/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

INFORMATION FILED

07/10/2020: INFORMATION FILED

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

07/10/2020: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

ORD ALLOW DEF COUNSEL W/D

07/01/2020: ORD ALLOW DEF COUNSEL W/D

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

06/30/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT/SENTENCE PACKET RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: OWN,LEASE,RENT,POSS FOR TRAFFICKING CONTR SUBS; Statute: 893.1351.2; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Amended; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 11/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: POSSESS OF OXYCODONE W/INT SELL,DELIVER; Statute: 893.13.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 11/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPENDING PROCESSING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATION ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/05/20 COPY SENT TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRe: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY KEILMORA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6/20/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: SELL SALE OF METHYLENDIOXMETHAMPHETAMINE (MDMA); Statute: 893.13.1A2; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200024292; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/19/2020; Name at Arrest : SURETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN; OBTS : 5301201944; Offense Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF OXYCODONE W/INT SELL,DELIVER; Statute: 893.13.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200024292; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/19/2020; Name at Arrest : SURETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN; OBTS : 5301201944; Offense Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: SELL POSS WITS/DEL/MANUF MDMA; Statute: 893.13.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200024292; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/19/2020; Name at Arrest : SURETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN; OBTS : 5301201944; Offense Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200024292; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/19/2020; Name at Arrest : SURETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN; OBTS : 5301201944; Offense Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: SELL SALE OF OXYCODONE; Statute: 893.13.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200024292; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/19/2020; Name at Arrest : SURETT-DELUCA CHRISTIN; OBTS : 5301201944; Offense Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAYLOR MATTHEW