This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/20/2022 at 18:39:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SMITH JOSEPH LEE

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH JOSEPH LEE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SMITH JOSEPH LEE

Lakeland, FL 33811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, P O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

HOLMES JEFFREY MILES

470 W Davidson St, P O Box 34

Bartow, FL 33831-0034

 

Court Documents

CAPIAS ISSUED

04/21/2022: CAPIAS ISSUED

DIRECT INFORMATION FILED

04/21/2022: DIRECT INFORMATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

04/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

ISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

04/21/2022: ISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

04/21/2022: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

CAPIAS SERVED 04/27/22

05/02/2022: CAPIAS SERVED 04/27/22

BOOKING SHEET

05/02/2022: BOOKING SHEET

BOND -DBB

05/02/2022: BOND -DBB

NOTICE TO APPEAR

05/02/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

COURT NOTIFICATION

05/05/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -DEFT

05/16/2022: NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -DEFT

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 05/17/22

05/17/2022: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 05/17/22

COURT NOTIFICATION

05/18/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (PA HOLMES)

06/01/2022: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (PA HOLMES)

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

06/01/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 06/02/2022

06/02/2022: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 06/02/2022

COURT NOTIFICATION

06/06/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/28/2022; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY SIENORTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/02/2022; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 06/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (PA HOLMES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 05/17/2022; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS SERVED 04/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketASA of Record, ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Initiated by Prosecutor/Direct; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECT INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LWPD220000131; Agency : LAKE WALES POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 04/27/2022; OBTS : 5309007076; Offense Date : 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH