This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 16:07:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RUEDEMAN MICHELLE LEE

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUEDEMAN MICHELLE LEE. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P MCDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

RUEDEMAN MICHELLE LEE

Lakeland, FL 33809

REUDEMAN MICHELLE

SHERROUSE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defender, Po Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

BOWLES GRACE KIMBERLY

Attorney at OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

Office Of Public Defender, Po Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

 

Court Documents

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

10/22/2021: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

10/19/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

10/15/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

FL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRANSCRIPT OF DRIVER RECORD

10/15/2021: FL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRANSCRIPT OF DRIVER RECORD

BOOKING SHEET

10/15/2021: BOOKING SHEET

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

10/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 11/16/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialEffective Date: 10/22/2021; Due Date: 10/29/2021; Fee Desc: Felony PD Application Fee; Fee Amount: 50.00; Total Amount Due: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAPD of Record, BOWLES GRACE KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 10/15/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW 8 E BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: FAHR - FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING; Section: M6; Judge: STACIE LEA KAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRANSCRIPT OF DRIVER RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY MAYABROW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: INTRO/POSSESS CONTRABAND IN JAIL/DETENTION FAC; Statute: 951.22; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FAIL TO HAVE MTR VEH LIABILITY INSURANCE; Statute: 324.221.2; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: KNOWINGLY DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSPENDED REVOKED; Statute: 322.34.2A; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: KNOWINGLY DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSPENDED REVOKED; Statute: 322.34.2; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS HARMFUL NEW LEGEND DRUG WO PRESCRIPTION; Statute: 499.03.1; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042830; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; Name at Arrest : RUEDEMAN MICHELLE; OBTS : 5309001561; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWLES GRACE KIMBERLY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMMIG HOWARD L II