This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/01/2023 at 01:07:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBERTS FLOYD LEE

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERTS FLOYD LEE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P MCDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

ROBERTS JAY LEE

ROBERTS FLOYD LEE JR

Lakeland, FL 33803-8307

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAIRD BROOKE-LYN

P O Box 9000 Drawer Sao, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33830

Defendant Attorney

KAYLOR MATTHEW

Attorney at KAYLOR LAW GROUP

Kaylor Law Group, 3001 Us Highway 98 South

Lakeland, FL 33803-0000

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

12/19/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

12/19/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -BONDSMAN UNCLAIMED

12/15/2022: NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -BONDSMAN UNCLAIMED

CERTIFIED MAIL

12/08/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL

CERTIFIED MAIL

12/08/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL

NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -DEFT

12/07/2022: NOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -DEFT

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

12/05/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

COURT NOTIFICATION

12/05/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, DEMAND DIS (PA KAYLOR)

12/02/2022: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, DEMAND DIS (PA KAYLOR)

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

CERTIFIED MAIL

11/18/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL

COURT NOTIFICATION

11/17/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

11/15/2022: ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

11/15/2022: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

INFORMATION FILED

11/15/2022: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE -ORIGINAL

11/08/2022: ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE -ORIGINAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/08/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

BOND -HDB2

11/08/2022: BOND -HDB2

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/31/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F2; Judge: MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -BONDSMAN UNCLAIMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTIF FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE -DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRe: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY JULICLAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY MAYABROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketRe: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY MAYABROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AGG BATTERY PERSON USES A DEADLY WEAPON; Statute: 784.045.1A2; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220044913; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/04/2022; OBTS : 5308016185; Offense Date : 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: ARMED BURGLARY(DWELLING); Statute: 810.02.2B; Level: F; Degree: L; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220044913; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/04/2022; OBTS : 5308016185; Offense Date : 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less